Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019