Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3041 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3041
1+By: Turner of Tarrant, Kacal H.B. No. 3041
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham, Menéndez)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2019;
4+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
5+ Commerce; May 21, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
6+ Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the renewal of a preauthorization for a medical or
613 health care service.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
916 by adding Chapter 1222 to read as follows:
1017 CHAPTER 1222. PREAUTHORIZATION FOR MEDICAL OR HEALTH CARE SERVICE
1118 Sec. 1222.0001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1219 (1) "Health benefit plan" means a plan to which this
1320 chapter applies under Section 1222.0002.
1421 (2) "Health benefit plan issuer" means an entity
1522 authorized under this code or another insurance law of this state
1623 that provides health insurance or health benefits in this state.
1724 (3) "Preauthorization" has the meaning assigned by
1825 Section 1301.001.
1926 Sec. 1222.0002. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) This
2027 chapter applies only to a health benefit plan that provides
2128 benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a
2229 health condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual,
2330 group, blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance
2431 agreement, a group hospital service contract, or an individual or
2532 group evidence of coverage or similar coverage document that is
2633 issued by:
2734 (1) an insurance company;
2835 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
2936 under Chapter 842;
3037 (3) a health maintenance organization operating under
3138 Chapter 843;
3239 (4) an approved nonprofit health corporation that
3340 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844;
3441 (5) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
3542 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846;
3643 (6) a stipulated premium company operating under
3744 Chapter 884;
3845 (7) a fraternal benefit society operating under
3946 Chapter 885;
4047 (8) a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter 941; or
4148 (9) an exchange operating under Chapter 942.
4249 (b) Notwithstanding any other law, this chapter applies to:
4350 (1) a small employer health benefit plan subject to
4451 Chapter 1501, including coverage provided through a health group
4552 cooperative under Subchapter B of that chapter;
4653 (2) a standard health benefit plan issued under
4754 Chapter 1507;
4855 (3) a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
4956 (4) a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
5057 (5) a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
5158 (6) a plan providing basic coverage under Chapter
5259 1601;
5360 (7) health benefits provided by or through a church
5461 benefits board under Subchapter I, Chapter 22, Business
5562 Organizations Code;
5663 (8) group health coverage made available by a school
5764 district in accordance with Section 22.004, Education Code;
5865 (9) the state Medicaid program, including the Medicaid
5966 managed care program operated under Chapter 533, Government Code;
6067 (10) the child health plan program under Chapter 62,
6168 Health and Safety Code;
6269 (11) a regional or local health care program operated
6370 under Section 75.104, Health and Safety Code; and
6471 (12) a self-funded health benefit plan sponsored by a
6572 professional employer organization under Chapter 91, Labor Code.
6673 Sec. 1222.0003. PREAUTHORIZATION RENEWAL REQUEST. A health
6774 benefit plan issuer that requires preauthorization as a condition
6875 of payment for a medical or health care service shall provide a
6976 preauthorization renewal process that allows a renewal of an
7077 existing preauthorization to be requested by a physician or health
7178 care provider at least 60 days before the date the preauthorization
7279 expires.
7380 Sec. 1222.0004. DETERMINATION REQUIRED. If a health
7481 benefit plan issuer receives a preauthorization renewal request
7582 before the existing preauthorization expires, the health benefit
7683 plan issuer shall, if practicable, review the request and issue a
7784 determination indicating whether the medical or health care service
7885 is preauthorized before the existing preauthorization expires.
7986 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
8087 to a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
8188 renewed on or after January 1, 2020. A health benefit plan that is
8289 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2020,
8390 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
8491 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
8592 that purpose.
8693 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
87- ______________________________ ______________________________
88- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
89- I certify that H.B. No. 3041 was passed by the House on May 2,
90- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 119, Nays 21, 1 present, not
91- voting.
92- ______________________________
93- Chief Clerk of the House
94- I certify that H.B. No. 3041 was passed by the Senate on May
95- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
96- ______________________________
97- Secretary of the Senate
98- APPROVED: _____________________
99- Date
100- _____________________
101- Governor
94+ * * * * *