Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB306 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/10/2019

                            H.B. No. 306


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an open burn pit registry for certain
 service members and veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Service Member and
 Veteran Open Burn Pit Registry Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 99 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 99.  OPEN BURN PIT REGISTRY
 Sec. 99.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Airborne hazard" means an airborne environmental
 contaminant, including open burn pit smoke, oil well fire smoke,
 sand, dust, or other particles, that may cause short-term or
 long-term health effects to a person exposed to the contaminant.
 (2)  "Open burn pit," also known as an "open air burn
 pit," means a site used for solid waste disposal by burning the
 waste in the outdoor air without the use of a commercially
 manufactured incinerator or other equipment specifically designed
 and manufactured for burning solid waste.
 (3)  "Service member" means an individual who is
 currently serving in:
 (A)  the armed forces of the United States;
 (B)  an auxiliary service of one of the armed
 forces of the United States, including the National Guard; or
 (C)  the state military forces as defined by
 Section 431.001, Government Code.
 (4)  "Veteran" means an individual who served in:
 (A)  the armed forces of the United States;
 (B)  an auxiliary service of one of the armed
 forces of the United States, including the National Guard; or
 (C)  the state military forces as defined by
 Section 431.001, Government Code.
 Sec. 99.002.  RULES; MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING. (a)  The
 executive commissioner shall adopt the rules necessary to
 administer this chapter and may enter into a memorandum of
 understanding with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
 as necessary to administer this chapter.
 (b)  A memorandum of understanding entered into under
 Subsection (a) must ensure that the United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs will maintain the confidentiality of a service
 member or veteran's personally identifying information that is
 submitted by the department to the Department of Veterans Affairs
 under this chapter.
 Sec. 99.003.  OPEN BURN PIT REGISTRY. (a) For outreach and
 education related to exposure to open burn pit smoke or other
 airborne hazards by service members and veterans in this state, the
 department shall create and maintain an open burn pit registry of
 service members and veterans who were exposed to open burn pit smoke
 or other airborne hazards during their military service in:
 (1)  the Southwest Asia theater of operations on or
 after August 2, 1990;
 (2)  Operation Desert Shield or Desert Storm;
 (3)  Djibouti, Africa, on or after September 11, 2001;
 (4)  Operation Enduring Freedom, Iraqi Freedom, or New
 Dawn; or
 (5)  any other conflict or theater identified by the
 United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
 (b)  The department shall include for each entry in the open
 burn pit registry:
 (1)  the service member's or veteran's name, address,
 telephone number, and e-mail address;
 (2)  the location of the service member's or veteran's
 service and the period of service;
 (3)  any medical condition or death of the service
 member or veteran that may be related to exposure to open burn pit
 smoke or other airborne hazards; and
 (4)  any other information that the department or the
 United States Department of Veterans Affairs considers necessary.
 (c)  The department shall:
 (1)  share the information included in the department's
 open burn pit registry with the United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry; and
 (2)  electronically link the open burn pit registry
 created under this chapter with the federal registry.
 Sec. 99.004.  VOLUNTARY REGISTRATION. A service member or
 veteran described by Section 99.003, or a family member of that
 service member or veteran, may voluntarily register a case of
 exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards with the
 department for inclusion in the registry.
 Sec. 99.005.  CONFIDENTIALITY. Entries and information
 obtained under this chapter are confidential and are not subject to
 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code, are not subject to
 subpoena, and may not otherwise be released or made public except to
 the United States Department of Veterans Affairs as provided by
 Section 99.003.
 Sec. 99.006.  OPEN BURN PIT INFORMATION. The department,
 with the assistance of the Texas Veterans Commission, shall develop
 and include on its Internet website information to inform service
 members, veterans, and their families about the:
 (1)  registration and use of the department's open burn
 pit registry and the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
 Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry;
 (2)  most recent scientific developments on the health
 effects of exposure to open burn pit smoke and other airborne
 hazards and the status of any illness or condition that is presumed
 to be caused by exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne
 hazards as designated by the United States Department of Veterans
 Affairs;
 (3)  availability of any treatment offered by the
 United States Department of Veterans Affairs for an illness or
 condition that may be caused by exposure to open burn pit smoke or
 other airborne hazards;
 (4)  process for applying to the United States
 Department of Veterans Affairs for service-related disability
 compensation for an illness or condition that may be related to
 exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards,
 including the methods for documenting the illness or condition; and
 (5)  manner of appealing to the United States
 Department of Veterans Affairs an existing service-related
 disability rating decision or requesting an increased
 service-related disability rating based on an illness or condition
 that may be related to exposure to open burn pit smoke or other
 airborne hazards.
 Sec. 99.007.  REPORT. Not later than December 1 of each
 even-numbered year following the creation of the registry, the
 department shall submit a report to the appropriate standing
 committees of the house of representatives and senate that
 includes:
 (1)  an assessment of the effectiveness of collection
 and maintenance of information on the health effects of exposure to
 open burn pit smoke and other airborne hazards; and
 (2)  any recommendation to improve the collection and
 maintenance of information about the health effects of exposure to
 open burn pit smoke and other airborne hazards.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Not later than March 1, 2020, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules and enter into any memorandum of understanding
 necessary to administer this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 99.007, Health and Safety Code,
 as added by this Act, the Department of State Health Services shall
 submit an initial report under that section not later than December
 1, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  The Department of State Health Services is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 306 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 122, Nays 13, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 306 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 104, Nays 1, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 306 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 2, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 19, Nays
 12.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor