1 | | - | H.B. No. 3081 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Noble (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 3081 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3081 By: Hall |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to a person qualified to serve as a temporary justice of |
---|
6 | 14 | | the peace. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Sections 27.055(c) and (e), Government Code, are |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (c) In this section [Subsections (b) and (f)], "qualified |
---|
11 | 19 | | person" means a person who has served as a justice of the peace, |
---|
12 | 20 | | county judge, or the judge of a county court at law for not less than |
---|
13 | 21 | | four [4 1/2] years and who has not been convicted of a criminal |
---|
14 | 22 | | offense that involves moral turpitude. |
---|
15 | 23 | | (e) The county judge may appoint any qualified voter under |
---|
16 | 24 | | Section 11.002, Election Code, who has experience and knowledge |
---|
17 | 25 | | relevant to judicial or justice court processes and procedures and |
---|
18 | 26 | | is approved by the county judge and a justice of the peace in the |
---|
19 | 27 | | county, to serve as a temporary justice of the peace if the judge |
---|
20 | 28 | | cannot find a qualified person who agrees to serve under this |
---|
21 | 29 | | section [Subsection (b) or (f)]. |
---|
22 | 30 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
23 | 31 | | to a temporary justice of the peace appointed on or after the |
---|
24 | 32 | | effective date of this Act. |
---|
25 | 33 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3081 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
29 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
30 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
31 | | - | No. 3081 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 7, |
---|
32 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
35 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3081 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
36 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
37 | | - | 0. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Date |
---|
42 | | - | __________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 34 | + | * * * * * |
---|