House | 04/25/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Filed |