Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3116 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3116
1+By: White (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3116
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
3+ April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Criminal Justice; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the
5+ following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a
612 comprehensive study on best practice standards for the detention of
713 persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "task force" means the task
1016 force on best practice standards for the detention of persons with
1117 intellectual and developmental disabilities established under this
1218 section.
1319 (b) The task force is established to conduct a comprehensive
1420 study on best practice standards for the detention of a person with
1521 an intellectual or developmental disability. The study must
1622 identify and make recommendations regarding the following with
1723 respect to the detention of persons with intellectual and
1824 developmental disabilities:
1925 (1) current policies and procedures;
2026 (2) barriers to accommodations and justice;
2127 (3) best practices used in other states;
2228 (4) policies that would improve jail standards; and
2329 (5) any other issue the task force considers
2430 appropriate.
2531 (c) The Commission on Jail Standards shall appoint the
2632 members of the task force. The task force must include at least:
2733 (1) one representative of the Commission on Jail
2834 Standards;
2935 (2) one representative of a statewide organization
3036 that advocates for individuals with intellectual and developmental
3137 disabilities;
3238 (3) one representative of a city or county
3339 governmental agency that supports persons with intellectual and
3440 developmental disabilities;
3541 (4) one representative of a city or county
3642 governmental agency that provides mental health services;
3743 (5) one representative of a statewide organization
3844 that represents municipalities;
3945 (6) one representative of a statewide organization
4046 that represents corrections professionals;
4147 (7) one representative of a law enforcement entity;
4248 and
4349 (8) one representative of a county jail.
4450 (d) The member appointed under Subsection (c)(1) of this
4551 section serves as the presiding officer of the task force.
4652 (e) The task force shall prepare a written report that
4753 includes:
4854 (1) a description of the activities of the task force;
4955 (2) the findings and recommendations of the task
5056 force;
5157 (3) a plan for how the best practice standards
5258 identified by the task force can be implemented statewide;
5359 (4) any proposals for legislation; and
5460 (5) any other matter the task force considers
5561 appropriate.
5662 (f) Not later than December 1, 2020, the task force shall
5763 submit the report prepared under this section to:
5864 (1) the governor;
5965 (2) the lieutenant governor;
6066 (3) the speaker of the house of representatives; and
6167 (4) the presiding officers of the standing committees
6268 of the senate and house of representatives having primary
6369 jurisdiction over issues relating to criminal justice.
6470 (g) The Commission on Jail Standards shall make the report
6571 available to the public on the commission's Internet website.
6672 (h) The task force is abolished and this Act expires
6773 September 1, 2021.
6874 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
69- ______________________________ ______________________________
70- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
71- I certify that H.B. No. 3116 was passed by the House on April
72- 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not
73- voting.
74- ______________________________
75- Chief Clerk of the House
76- I certify that H.B. No. 3116 was passed by the Senate on May
77- 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
78- ______________________________
79- Secretary of the Senate
80- APPROVED: _____________________
81- Date
82- _____________________
83- Governor
75+ * * * * *