1 | | - | H.B. No. 3143 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Murphy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3143 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 4 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 16, 2019, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 6 | + | vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3143 By: Powell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act. |
---|
6 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 312.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
8 | 16 | | Subsections (c-1) and (c-2) to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 17 | | (c-1) Before the governing body of a taxing unit may adopt, |
---|
10 | 18 | | amend, repeal, or reauthorize guidelines and criteria, the body |
---|
11 | 19 | | must hold a public hearing regarding the proposed adoption, |
---|
12 | 20 | | amendment, repeal, or reauthorization at which members of the |
---|
13 | 21 | | public are given the opportunity to be heard. |
---|
14 | 22 | | (c-2) A taxing unit that maintains an Internet website shall |
---|
15 | 23 | | post the current version of the guidelines and criteria governing |
---|
16 | 24 | | tax abatement agreements adopted under this section on the website. |
---|
17 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Section 312.005, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
18 | 26 | | Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 27 | | (a-1) For each of the first three tax years following the |
---|
20 | 28 | | expiration of a tax abatement agreement executed under this |
---|
21 | 29 | | chapter, the chief appraiser shall deliver to the comptroller a |
---|
22 | 30 | | report containing the appraised value of the property that was the |
---|
23 | 31 | | subject of the agreement. |
---|
24 | 32 | | SECTION 3. Section 312.006, Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
25 | 33 | | follows: |
---|
26 | 34 | | Sec. 312.006. EXPIRATION DATE. If not continued in effect, |
---|
27 | 35 | | this chapter expires September 1, 2029 [2019]. |
---|
28 | 36 | | SECTION 4. Section 312.207, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
29 | 37 | | Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: |
---|
30 | 38 | | (c) In addition to any other requirement of law, the public |
---|
31 | 39 | | notice of a meeting at which the governing body of a municipality or |
---|
32 | 40 | | other taxing unit will consider the approval of a tax abatement |
---|
33 | 41 | | agreement with a property owner must contain: |
---|
37 | 43 | | (2) the name and location of the reinvestment zone in |
---|
38 | 44 | | which the property subject to the agreement is located; |
---|
39 | 45 | | (3) a general description of the nature of the |
---|
40 | 46 | | improvements or repairs included in the agreement; and |
---|
41 | 47 | | (4) the estimated cost of the improvements or repairs. |
---|
42 | 48 | | (d) The notice of a meeting required by this section must be |
---|
43 | 49 | | given in the manner required by Chapter 551, Government Code, |
---|
44 | 50 | | except that the notice must be provided at least 30 days before the |
---|
45 | 51 | | scheduled time of the meeting. |
---|
46 | 52 | | SECTION 5. Subchapter C, Chapter 312, Tax Code, is amended |
---|
47 | 53 | | by adding Section 312.404 to read as follows: |
---|
48 | 54 | | Sec. 312.404. APPROVAL BY GOVERNING BODY. To be effective, |
---|
49 | 55 | | an agreement made under this subchapter must be approved by the |
---|
50 | 56 | | governing body of the county or other taxing unit in the manner that |
---|
51 | 57 | | the governing body of a municipality authorizes an agreement under |
---|
52 | 58 | | Section 312.207. |
---|
53 | 59 | | SECTION 6. Section 312.002(c-1), Tax Code, as added by this |
---|
54 | 60 | | Act, applies only to the adoption, amendment, repeal, or |
---|
55 | 61 | | reauthorization of guidelines and criteria under Section 312.002, |
---|
56 | 62 | | Tax Code, on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
57 | 63 | | SECTION 7. Section 312.005(a-1), Tax Code, as added by this |
---|
58 | 64 | | Act, applies only to a tax abatement agreement entered into under |
---|
59 | 65 | | Chapter 312 of that code that expires on or after the effective date |
---|
60 | 66 | | of this Act. |
---|
61 | 67 | | SECTION 8. Sections 312.207(c) and (d) and 312.404, Tax |
---|
62 | 68 | | Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a tax abatement agreement |
---|
63 | 69 | | entered into on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
64 | 70 | | SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
67 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3143 was passed by the House on April |
---|
68 | | - | 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
69 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
70 | | - | No. 3143 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 7, |
---|
71 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
72 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
74 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3143 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
75 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
76 | | - | 1. |
---|
77 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
79 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
80 | | - | Date |
---|
81 | | - | __________________ |
---|
82 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 71 | + | * * * * * |
---|