Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3148 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 3148
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3148 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration and oversight of investigational
 adult stem cell treatments administered to certain patients.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1003, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 1003.0525 and 1003.0526 to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 1003.0525.  ADMINISTRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. The
 department shall administer this subchapter.
 Sec. 1003.0526.  INVESTIGATIONAL STEM CELL REGISTRY. The
 department shall establish and maintain an investigational stem
 cell registry that lists each physician who administers an
 investigational stem cell treatment under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1003.054(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The executive commissioner by rule shall [may] adopt a
 form for the informed consent under this section. The form must
 provide notice that the department administers this subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1003.055(d), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  An institutional review board that oversees
 investigational stem cell treatments administered under this
 subchapter must meet one of the following conditions [be affiliated
 with]:
 (1)  be affiliated with a medical school, as defined by
 Section 61.501, Education Code; [or]
 (2)  be affiliated with a hospital licensed under
 Chapter 241 that has at least 150 beds;
 (3)  be accredited by the Association for the
 Accreditation of Human Research Protection Programs;
 (4)  be registered by the United States Department of
 Health and Human Services, Office for Human Research Protections,
 in accordance with 21 C.F.R. Part 56; or
 (5)  be accredited by a national accreditation
 organization acceptable to the Texas Medical Board.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1003.058(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A governmental entity or an officer, employee, or agent
 of a governmental entity may not interfere with an eligible
 patient's access to or use of an investigational [a] stem cell
 treatment authorized under this subchapter unless the treatment
 uses an adult stem cell product that is considered an adulterated or
 misbranded drug under Chapter 431. For purposes of this subsection,
 a governmental entity may not consider the adult stem cell product
 to be an adulterated or misbranded drug solely on the basis that the
 United States Food and Drug Administration has not approved the
 adult stem cell product.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1003, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 1003.060 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1003.060.  CONSTRUCTION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 may not be construed to:
 (1)  prohibit a physician from using adult stem cells
 for their intended homologous use if the stem cells are:
 (A)  produced by a manufacturer registered by the
 United States Food and Drug Administration; and
 (B)  commercially available; or
 (2)  require an institutional review board to oversee
 treatment using adult stem cells registered by the United States
 Food and Drug Administration for their intended homologous use.
 SECTION 6.  The Department of State Health Services is not
 required to establish the investigational stem cell registry
 described by Section 1003.0526, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, until September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *