Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3148 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3148
1+By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 3148
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2019;
3+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3148 By: Perry
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the administration and oversight of investigational
614 adult stem cell treatments administered to certain patients.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 1003, Health and Safety
917 Code, is amended by adding Sections 1003.0525 and 1003.0526 to read
1018 as follows:
1119 Sec. 1003.0525. ADMINISTRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. The
1220 department shall administer this subchapter.
1321 Sec. 1003.0526. INVESTIGATIONAL STEM CELL REGISTRY. The
1422 department shall establish and maintain an investigational stem
1523 cell registry that lists each physician who administers an
1624 investigational stem cell treatment under this subchapter.
1725 SECTION 2. Section 1003.054(c), Health and Safety Code, is
1826 amended to read as follows:
1927 (c) The executive commissioner by rule shall [may] adopt a
2028 form for the informed consent under this section. The form must
2129 provide notice that the department administers this subchapter.
2230 SECTION 3. Section 1003.055(d), Health and Safety Code, is
2331 amended to read as follows:
2432 (d) An institutional review board that oversees
2533 investigational stem cell treatments administered under this
2634 subchapter must meet one of the following conditions [be affiliated
2735 with]:
2836 (1) be affiliated with a medical school, as defined by
2937 Section 61.501, Education Code; [or]
3038 (2) be affiliated with a hospital licensed under
3139 Chapter 241 that has at least 150 beds;
3240 (3) be accredited by the Association for the
3341 Accreditation of Human Research Protection Programs;
3442 (4) be registered by the United States Department of
3543 Health and Human Services, Office for Human Research Protections,
3644 in accordance with 21 C.F.R. Part 56; or
3745 (5) be accredited by a national accreditation
3846 organization acceptable to the Texas Medical Board.
3947 SECTION 4. Section 1003.058(b), Health and Safety Code, is
4048 amended to read as follows:
4149 (b) A governmental entity or an officer, employee, or agent
4250 of a governmental entity may not interfere with an eligible
4351 patient's access to or use of an investigational [a] stem cell
4452 treatment authorized under this subchapter unless the treatment
4553 uses an adult stem cell product that is considered an adulterated or
4654 misbranded drug under Chapter 431. For purposes of this subsection,
4755 a governmental entity may not consider the adult stem cell product
4856 to be an adulterated or misbranded drug solely on the basis that the
4957 United States Food and Drug Administration has not approved the
5058 adult stem cell product.
5159 SECTION 5. Subchapter B, Chapter 1003, Health and Safety
5260 Code, is amended by adding Section 1003.060 to read as follows:
5361 Sec. 1003.060. CONSTRUCTION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
5462 may not be construed to:
5563 (1) prohibit a physician from using adult stem cells
5664 for their intended homologous use if the stem cells are:
5765 (A) produced by a manufacturer registered by the
5866 United States Food and Drug Administration; and
5967 (B) commercially available; or
6068 (2) require an institutional review board to oversee
6169 treatment using adult stem cells registered by the United States
6270 Food and Drug Administration for their intended homologous use.
63- SECTION 6. The Department of State Health Services may not
64- establish the investigational stem cell registry described by
65- Section 1003.0526, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
66- until September 1, 2027.
71+ SECTION 6. The Department of State Health Services is not
72+ required to establish the investigational stem cell registry
73+ described by Section 1003.0526, Health and Safety Code, as added by
74+ this Act, until September 1, 2027.
6775 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
68- ______________________________ ______________________________
69- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
70- I certify that H.B. No. 3148 was passed by the House on May 9,
71- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 present, not
72- voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
73- H.B. No. 3148 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
74- conference committee to consider the differences between the two
75- houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
76- on H.B. No. 3148 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
77- Nays 0, 3 present, not voting.
78- ______________________________
79- Chief Clerk of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 3148 was passed by the Senate, with
81- amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
82- 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
83- committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
84- that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
85- 3148 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
86- ______________________________
87- Secretary of the Senate
88- APPROVED: __________________
89- Date
90- __________________
91- Governor
76+ * * * * *