Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3162 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2019

                            By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 3162
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prepaid funeral benefits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 154.302, Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 154.302.  NOTICE OF ABANDONED MONEY. On March 1 [June
 30] of each year, a seller that holds money presumed abandoned under
 Section 154.301(b) shall furnish the commissioner with an
 acknowledged written notice of the abandoned money not later than
 the following June [October] 1. The notice must include:
 (1)  the name and address, if known, of each person who
 appears to be the purchaser or the beneficiary of the contract;
 (2)  the identification number, if any, of the
 contract;
 (3)  the total amount paid on the contract;
 (4)  the amount paid on the contract and held at the
 depository;
 (5)  the earnings of the contract; and
 (6)  a statement by the seller recognizing the seller's
 obligation and intent to deliver the abandoned money to the
 comptroller in accordance with this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 154.304, Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 154.304.  DELIVERY TO COMPTROLLER OF ABANDONED MONEY
 AND REPORT. Not later than the first July [November] 1 after the
 date a seller is required to furnish notice to the commissioner
 under [receives the notice required by] Section 154.302, the seller
 shall deliver to the comptroller:
 (1)  the abandoned money; and
 (2)  the report required to be filed under Chapter 74,
 Property Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 154.400, Finance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The commissioner may recover the reasonable costs
 incurred in connection with an investigation conducted under this
 section from the person who is the subject of the investigation if,
 after a hearing conducted as provided by Chapter 2001, Government
 Code, the trier of fact determines that the person violated this
 chapter or a rule adopted under this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  Section 154.400(e), Finance Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a violation that occurs or an
 investigation conducted on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *