Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3203 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Dean (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3203
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the division of certain emergency services districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 775.221, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.221.  AUTHORITY TO DIVIDE DISTRICT. (a) This
 subchapter applies only to a district located wholly in:
 (1)  a county with a population of 20,000 or less; or
 (2)  a county with a population of more than 30,000 but
 less than 41,000 that is adjacent to a county with a population of
 more than 200,000 but less than 220,000.
 (b)  The board of a district described by Subsection (a)
 [located wholly in one county with a population of 20,000 or less]
 may create a new district by disannexing territory from the
 existing district and ordering a new district to be created in the
 disannexed territory in the manner provided by this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 775.223(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The [If the board finds that the petition contains the
 number of signatures required under Section 775.222(a), the] board
 shall approve the petition not later than the 10th day after the
 date of the hearing if the board finds that:
 (1)  the petition contains the number of signatures
 required under Section 775.222(a); and
 (2)  the proposed division is feasible.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 775.223(c), Health and Safety Code, applies only to the division of
 an emergency services district the petition for which is submitted
 on or after the effective date of this Act. The division of an
 emergency services district the petition for which is submitted
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the petition is submitted, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *