Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3227 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2019

                    By: Howard, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3227
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3227 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of and access to certain programs and
 services for persons in the custody of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 493, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 493.032 to read as follows:
 Sec. 493.032.  AVAILABILITY OF PEER SUPPORT SERVICES. (a)
 The department shall adopt a policy to increase the availability of
 formal and informal peer support services, including certified peer
 specialist services, to a person confined in a facility operated by
 or under contract with the department, including a state jail
 felony facility, substance abuse felony punishment facility, or
 intermediate sanction facility.
 (b)  The policy adopted under Subsection (a) must:
 (1)  allow for persons who have previously been
 convicted of an offense, including releasees on parole or mandatory
 supervision and defendants on community supervision, to serve as
 certified peer specialists in a facility described by Subsection
 (a);
 (2)  specify the conditions under which a person
 described by Subdivision (1) may serve as a certified peer
 specialist; and
 (3)  allow for persons confined in a facility described
 by Subsection (a) to serve in a peer support role, provided that the
 persons are trained and supervised by a community-based
 organization described by Subsection (c).
 (c)  In implementing the policy adopted under Subsection
 (a), the department shall:
 (1)  collaborate with community-based organizations
 that provide peer specialist training, including training in any of
 the following peer support specialties:
 (A)  certified peer specialist;
 (B)  certified peer reentry specialist;
 (C)  certified peer recovery specialist; or
 (D)  any other peer support specialty recognized
 by the Health and Human Services Commission; and
 (2)  encourage and assist persons described by
 Subsection (b)(3), with particular emphasis on persons who have
 been involved with programs or services relating to substance abuse
 or behavioral health, to participate in training described by
 Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 501.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.026.  ACCESS TO PROGRAMS BY FEMALE INMATES. (a)
 The department shall develop and implement policies that increase
 and promote a female inmate's access to programs offered to inmates
 in the custody of the department, including educational,
 vocational, substance use treatment, rehabilitation, life skills
 training, and prerelease programs. The department may not reduce
 or limit a male inmate's access to a program to meet the
 requirements of this section.
 (b)  Not later than December 31 of each year, the department
 shall:
 (1)  prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, each
 standing committee of the legislature having primary jurisdiction
 over the department, and the reentry task force described by
 Section 501.098 a written report that includes:
 (A)  a description of any department policies that
 were created, modified, or eliminated during the preceding year to
 meet the requirements of this section; and
 (B)  a list of programs available to female
 inmates in the custody of the department during the preceding year;
 and
 (2)  publish the report on the department's Internet
 website.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt and implement the policy
 required by Section 493.032, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall
 develop and implement the policies required by Section 501.026,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall submit
 the first report required by Section 501.026, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, not later than December 31, 2020.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *