Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3227 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3227
1+By: Howard, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3227
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
3+ April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Criminal Justice; May 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
6+ May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3227 By: Whitmire
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the availability of and access to certain programs and
614 services for persons in the custody of the Texas Department of
715 Criminal Justice.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Chapter 493, Government Code, is amended by
1018 adding Section 493.032 to read as follows:
1119 Sec. 493.032. AVAILABILITY OF PEER SUPPORT SERVICES. (a)
1220 The department shall adopt a policy to increase the availability of
1321 formal and informal peer support services, including certified peer
1422 specialist services, to a person confined in a facility operated by
1523 or under contract with the department, including a state jail
1624 felony facility, substance abuse felony punishment facility, or
1725 intermediate sanction facility.
1826 (b) The policy adopted under Subsection (a) must:
1927 (1) allow for persons who have previously been
2028 convicted of an offense, including releasees on parole or mandatory
2129 supervision and defendants on community supervision, to serve as
2230 certified peer specialists in a facility described by Subsection
2331 (a);
2432 (2) specify the conditions under which a person
2533 described by Subdivision (1) may serve as a certified peer
2634 specialist; and
2735 (3) allow for persons confined in a facility described
2836 by Subsection (a) to serve in a peer support role, provided that the
2937 persons are trained and supervised by a community-based
3038 organization described by Subsection (c).
3139 (c) In implementing the policy adopted under Subsection
3240 (a), the department shall:
3341 (1) collaborate with community-based organizations
3442 that provide peer specialist training, including training in any of
3543 the following peer support specialties:
3644 (A) certified peer specialist;
3745 (B) certified peer reentry specialist;
3846 (C) certified peer recovery specialist; or
3947 (D) any other peer support specialty recognized
4048 by the Health and Human Services Commission; and
4149 (2) encourage and assist persons described by
4250 Subsection (b)(3), with particular emphasis on persons who have
4351 been involved with programs or services relating to substance abuse
4452 or behavioral health, to participate in training described by
4553 Subdivision (1).
4654 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
4755 amended by adding Section 501.026 to read as follows:
4856 Sec. 501.026. ACCESS TO PROGRAMS BY FEMALE INMATES. (a)
4957 The department shall develop and implement policies that increase
5058 and promote a female inmate's access to programs offered to inmates
5159 in the custody of the department, including educational,
5260 vocational, substance use treatment, rehabilitation, life skills
5361 training, and prerelease programs. The department may not reduce
5462 or limit a male inmate's access to a program to meet the
5563 requirements of this section.
5664 (b) Not later than December 31 of each year, the department
5765 shall:
5866 (1) prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant
5967 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, each
6068 standing committee of the legislature having primary jurisdiction
6169 over the department, and the reentry task force described by
6270 Section 501.098 a written report that includes:
6371 (A) a description of any department policies that
6472 were created, modified, or eliminated during the preceding year to
6573 meet the requirements of this section; and
6674 (B) a list of programs available to female
6775 inmates in the custody of the department during the preceding year;
6876 and
6977 (2) publish the report on the department's Internet
7078 website.
7179 SECTION 3. Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas
7280 Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt and implement the policy
7381 required by Section 493.032, Government Code, as added by this Act.
7482 SECTION 4. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
7583 date of this Act, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall
7684 develop and implement the policies required by Section 501.026,
7785 Government Code, as added by this Act.
7886 (b) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall submit
7987 the first report required by Section 501.026, Government Code, as
8088 added by this Act, not later than December 31, 2020.
8189 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
82- ______________________________ ______________________________
83- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
84- I certify that H.B. No. 3227 was passed by the House on April
85- 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not
86- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
87- No. 3227 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 2,
88- 2 present, not voting.
89- ______________________________
90- Chief Clerk of the House
91- I certify that H.B. No. 3227 was passed by the Senate, with
92- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
93- 0.
94- ______________________________
95- Secretary of the Senate
96- APPROVED: __________________
97- Date
98- __________________
99- Governor
90+ * * * * *