1 | 1 | | 86R12379 TSS-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: González of El Paso H.B. No. 3237 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to a temporary suspension of accountability sanctions for |
---|
8 | 8 | | public schools and to studies on accountability assessment |
---|
9 | 9 | | instruments. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter K, Chapter 39, Education Code, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by adding Section 39.335 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 39.335. ALTERNATIVE ACCOUNTABILITY INSTRUMENT STUDY. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (a) The agency shall conduct a study on potential alternative |
---|
15 | 15 | | assessment instruments that may be used for purposes of the state |
---|
16 | 16 | | accountability system instead of the assessment instruments |
---|
17 | 17 | | adopted under Section 39.023. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2020, the agency shall submit |
---|
19 | 19 | | a report to the legislature that includes the results of the study |
---|
20 | 20 | | and any recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 39A, Education Code, is |
---|
23 | 23 | | amended by adding Section 39A.907 to read as follows: |
---|
24 | 24 | | Sec. 39A.907. TEMPORARY SUSPENSION OF SANCTIONS; |
---|
25 | 25 | | ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENT STUDY. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, |
---|
26 | 26 | | interventions and sanctions under this chapter may not be applied |
---|
27 | 27 | | to a school district or campus for an unacceptable performance |
---|
28 | 28 | | rating under Section 39.054 received for the 2019-2020 or 2020-2021 |
---|
29 | 29 | | school year. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) The performance rating assigned to a school district or |
---|
31 | 31 | | campus for the 2019-2020 or 2020-2021 school year may not be used as |
---|
32 | 32 | | the basis for the imposition of any intervention or sanction |
---|
33 | 33 | | authorized by this chapter after the 2020-2021 school year, |
---|
34 | 34 | | including an intervention or sanction authorized by Section 39A.101 |
---|
35 | 35 | | or 39A.111. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (c) The commissioner shall conduct a study to determine |
---|
37 | 37 | | whether, for each applicable grade level, each assessment |
---|
38 | 38 | | instrument administered under Section 39.023(a) is written at the |
---|
39 | 39 | | appropriate reading level for students in that grade level. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (d) As part of the study required by Subsection (c), the |
---|
41 | 41 | | commissioner shall provide notice of and hold at least one public |
---|
42 | 42 | | hearing to receive public comment. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (e) Not later than August 1, 2020, the commissioner shall |
---|
44 | 44 | | submit a report to the legislature that includes the results of the |
---|
45 | 45 | | study, a summary of the comments from the public hearing or |
---|
46 | 46 | | hearings, and any recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (f) If the report submitted by the commissioner under |
---|
48 | 48 | | Subsection (e) indicates that any assessment instrument adopted |
---|
49 | 49 | | under Section 39.023(a) was written at a reading level above the |
---|
50 | 50 | | grade level of the students to which the assessment instrument was |
---|
51 | 51 | | administered, the commissioner shall revise the performance |
---|
52 | 52 | | standard for that assessment instrument under Section 39.0241 as |
---|
53 | 53 | | necessary to more accurately reflect student performance. |
---|
54 | 54 | | (g) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
55 | 55 | | SECTION 3. Section 39A.907, Education Code, as added by |
---|
56 | 56 | | this Act, applies beginning with the 2019-2020 school year. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
58 | 58 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
59 | 59 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
60 | 60 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
61 | 61 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|