House | 04/30/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/13/2018 | Filed |