Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3325 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2019

                    86R9598 LED-F
 By: Oliverson H.B. No. 3325


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of a temporary health insurance risk
 pool.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1510.002, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1510.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE
 RISK POOL.  To the extent that federal funds become available under
 federal law[, regulation, or executive action after March 1, 2017],
 the commissioner may:
 (1)  apply for such funds; and
 (2)  use such funds to establish and administer a
 temporary health insurance risk pool for the purposes of this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1510.008(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioner may apply to the United States
 secretary of health and human services:
 (1)  under 42 U.S.C. Section 18052 for a waiver of
 applicable provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care
 Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) and any applicable regulations or
 guidance; or
 (2)  under any applicable provision of federal law
 [enacted on or after May 1, 2017,] for a waiver of applicable
 provisions of any federal law, regulations, or guidance with
 respect to health insurance coverage consistent with Section
 1510.003.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1510.012(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning June 1, 2020 [2018], not later than June 1 of
 each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1510.013, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1510.013.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter
 expires August 31, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.