1 | 1 | | 86R9598 LED-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Oliverson H.B. No. 3325 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the administration of a temporary health insurance risk |
---|
8 | 8 | | pool. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 1510.002, Insurance Code, is amended to |
---|
11 | 11 | | read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 1510.002. ESTABLISHMENT OF TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE |
---|
13 | 13 | | RISK POOL. To the extent that federal funds become available under |
---|
14 | 14 | | federal law[, regulation, or executive action after March 1, 2017], |
---|
15 | 15 | | the commissioner may: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) apply for such funds; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) use such funds to establish and administer a |
---|
18 | 18 | | temporary health insurance risk pool for the purposes of this |
---|
19 | 19 | | chapter. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 1510.008(a), Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
21 | 21 | | to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (a) The commissioner may apply to the United States |
---|
23 | 23 | | secretary of health and human services: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) under 42 U.S.C. Section 18052 for a waiver of |
---|
25 | 25 | | applicable provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care |
---|
26 | 26 | | Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) and any applicable regulations or |
---|
27 | 27 | | guidance; or |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) under any applicable provision of federal law |
---|
29 | 29 | | [enacted on or after May 1, 2017,] for a waiver of applicable |
---|
30 | 30 | | provisions of any federal law, regulations, or guidance with |
---|
31 | 31 | | respect to health insurance coverage consistent with Section |
---|
32 | 32 | | 1510.003. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 3. Section 1510.012(a), Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
34 | 34 | | to read as follows: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (a) Beginning June 1, 2020 [2018], not later than June 1 of |
---|
36 | 36 | | each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor, the |
---|
37 | 37 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
38 | 38 | | representatives. |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 4. Section 1510.013, Insurance Code, is amended to |
---|
40 | 40 | | read as follows: |
---|
41 | 41 | | Sec. 1510.013. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter |
---|
42 | 42 | | expires August 31, 2021 [2019]. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
44 | 44 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
45 | 45 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
46 | 46 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
47 | 47 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|