Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3348 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Guillen, Springer (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3348
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Property Tax; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of land on which the Texas Animal Health
 Commission has established a temporary quarantine for ticks for
 appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes as agricultural or open-space
 land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 23, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.426 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.426.  TEMPORARY CESSATION OF AGRICULTURAL USE DUE TO
 QUARANTINE FOR TICKS. (a)  The entitlement of an individual to have
 land the individual owns designated for agricultural use under this
 subchapter does not end because the individual ceases exclusively
 or continuously using the land for agriculture as an occupation or a
 business venture for profit for the period prescribed by Subsection
 (b) if the land:
 (1)  is subject to a temporary quarantine established
 at any time during the tax year by the Texas Animal Health
 Commission for the purpose of regulating the handling of livestock
 and eradicating ticks or exposure to ticks under Chapter 167,
 Agriculture Code; and
 (2)  otherwise continues to qualify for the designation
 under Section 23.42.
 (b)  Subsection (a) applies to land eligible for appraisal
 under this subchapter only during the period that begins on the date
 the land is designated as a tick eradication area and that ends on
 the date the land is released from quarantine by the Texas Animal
 Health Commission.
 (c)  The owner of land to which this section applies must,
 not later than the 30th day after the date the land is designated as
 a tick eradication area, notify in writing the chief appraiser for
 each appraisal district in which the land is located that the land
 is located in a tick eradication area.
 (d)  The owner of land to which this section applies must,
 not later than the 30th day after the date the land is released from
 quarantine by the Texas Animal Health Commission, notify in writing
 the chief appraiser for each appraisal district in which the land is
 located that the land has been released from quarantine by the Texas
 Animal Health Commission.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.526 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.526.  TEMPORARY CESSATION OF AGRICULTURAL USE DUE TO
 QUARANTINE FOR TICKS. (a)  The eligibility of land for appraisal
 under this subchapter does not end because the land ceases to be
 devoted principally to agricultural use to the degree of intensity
 generally accepted in the area for the period prescribed by
 Subsection (b) if the land:
 (1)  is subject to a temporary quarantine established
 at any time during the tax year by the Texas Animal Health
 Commission for the purpose of regulating the handling of livestock
 and eradicating ticks or exposure to ticks under Chapter 167,
 Agriculture Code;
 (2)  is appraised under this subchapter primarily on
 the basis of the livestock located in the area subject to quarantine
 in the tax year; and
 (3)  otherwise continues to qualify for appraisal under
 this subchapter.
 (b)  Subsection (a) applies to land eligible for appraisal
 under this subchapter only during the period that begins on the date
 the land is designated as a tick eradication area and that ends on
 the date the land is released from quarantine by the Texas Animal
 Health Commission.
 (c)  The owner of land to which this section applies must,
 not later than the 30th day after the date the land is designated as
 a tick eradication area, notify in writing the chief appraiser for
 each appraisal district in which the land is located that the land
 is located in a tick eradication area.
 (d)  The owner of land to which this section applies must,
 not later than the 30th day after the date the land is released from
 quarantine by the Texas Animal Health Commission, notify in writing
 the chief appraiser for each appraisal district in which the land is
 located that the land has been released from quarantine by the Texas
 Animal Health Commission.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect an additional tax imposed as a result of a change of use of
 land appraised under Subchapter C or D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, that
 occurred before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *