Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3383 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Bell of Kaufman, et al. H.B. No. 3383
 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of a tier 1 county for purposes of
 municipal annexation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.001(2), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Tier 1 county" means a county:
 (A)  with a population of less than 500,000; and
 (B)  that is not:
 (i)  a county that contains a freshwater
 fisheries center operated by the [Texas] Parks and Wildlife
 Department; or
 (ii)  a county with a population of less than
 125,000:
 (a)  that is adjacent to a county with
 a population of more than 2.2 million;
 (b)  that contains any portion of the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality with a population
 of more than 1.1 million; and
 (c)  in which more than one municipal
 utility district registered with the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality as being active is located.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *