Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3391 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 86R11267 SRA-F
22 By: Shine H.B. No. 3391
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to awarding certain medals for military service performed
88 individually or as part of a crew.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Section 437.352, Government Code, is amended to
1111 read as follows:
1212 Sec. 437.352. LONE STAR MEDAL OF VALOR. The Lone Star Medal
1313 of Valor shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this
1414 state, another state, or the United States who performs, either
1515 individually or as a member of a crew, specific acts of bravery or
1616 outstanding courage, or who performs within an exceptionally short
1717 period, either individually or as a member of a crew, a closely
1818 related series of heroic acts, if the acts involve personal hazard
1919 or danger and the voluntary risk of life and result in an
2020 accomplishment so exceptional and outstanding as to clearly set the
2121 person or crew apart from the person's or crew's comrades or from
2222 other persons in similar circumstances. Awarding of the medal
2323 requires a lesser degree of gallantry than awarding of the Texas
2424 Legislative Medal of Honor, but requires that the acts be performed
2525 with marked distinction.
2626 SECTION 2. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, is amended
2727 to read as follows:
2828 (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the
2929 authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding:
3030 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
3131 awarded to a service member who:
3232 (A) after September 11, 2001:
3333 (i) was inducted into federal service from
3434 the Texas National Guard; and
3535 (ii) meets the criteria for an award of the
3636 federal Purple Heart Medal; or
3737 (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
3838 November 5, 2009;
3939 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
4040 awarded to:
4141 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
4242 who has:
4343 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
4444 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
4545 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
4646 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
4747 demanding responsibility; or
4848 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
4949 service to the Texas military forces;
5050 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
5151 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
5252 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
5353 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
5454 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
5555 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
5656 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
5757 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
5858 achievement or service; and
5959 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
6060 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
6161 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
6262 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
6363 another state, or the United States who has performed service,
6464 either individually or as a member of a crew, in a superior and
6565 clearly outstanding manner;
6666 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
6767 be awarded to a service member who:
6868 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
6969 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
7070 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
7171 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
7272 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
7373 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
7474 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
7575 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
7676 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
7777 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
7878 who served:
7979 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
8080 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
8181 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
8282 and
8383 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
8484 mission in the state under civilian authority;
8585 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
8686 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
8787 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
8888 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
8989 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
9090 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
9191 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
9292 the United States secretary of defense;
9393 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
9494 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
9595 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
9696 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
9797 this state;
9898 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
9999 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
100100 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
101101 extraordinary achievement, either individually or as a member of a
102102 crew, in behalf of the state or United States;
103103 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
104104 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
105105 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
106106 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
107107 great loyalty to this state;
108108 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
109109 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
110110 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
111111 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
112112 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
113113 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
114114 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
115115 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
116116 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
117117 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
118118 military duty, after:
119119 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
120120 Freedom; or
121121 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
122122 Dawn;
123123 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
124124 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
125125 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
126126 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
127127 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
128128 military duty; and
129129 (15) the Cold War Medal, which, subject to Subsection
130130 (c), shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this
131131 state or the United States who:
132132 (A) served between September 2, 1945, and
133133 December 26, 1991; and
134134 (B) was a resident of this state at the time the
135135 service member entered military service.
136136 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.