Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3405 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3405
1+By: Johnson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 3405
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Miles)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
4+ April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
5+ Human Services; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following
6+ vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the establishment of a sickle cell task force.
613 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
714 SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
815 amended by adding Chapter 50 to read as follows:
916 CHAPTER 50. SICKLE CELL TASK FORCE
1017 Sec. 50.001. ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE. The executive
1118 commissioner, in collaboration with the members appointed to the
1219 Newborn Screening Advisory Committee to represent the sickle cell
1320 community, shall establish and maintain a task force to raise
1421 awareness of sickle cell disease and sickle cell trait.
1522 Sec. 50.002. DUTIES. (a) The task force shall study and
1623 advise the department on implementing the recommendations made in
1724 the 2018 Sickle Cell Advisory Committee Report published by the
1825 Sickle Cell Advisory Committee or any other report the executive
1926 commissioner determines is appropriate.
2027 (b) The executive commissioner may assign tasks to the task
2128 force to accomplish the purposes of this chapter.
2229 Sec. 50.003. COMPOSITION OF TASK FORCE. The task force is
2330 composed of the following members appointed by the executive
2431 commissioner:
2532 (1) two members from community-based organizations
2633 with experience addressing the needs of individuals with sickle
2734 cell disease;
2835 (2) two physicians specializing in hematology;
2936 (3) two members of the public, each of whom either has
3037 sickle cell disease or is a parent of a person with sickle cell
3138 disease or trait; and
3239 (4) one representative of a health-related
3340 institution.
3441 Sec. 50.004. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The executive
3542 commissioner shall provide administrative support services at the
3643 request of the task force.
3744 Sec. 50.005. PRESIDING OFFICER; MEETINGS. (a) The task
3845 force shall elect a presiding officer from among its membership.
3946 (b) The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
4047 officer.
4148 (c) The task force shall hold its first meeting not later
4249 than December 1, 2019. This subsection expires September 1, 2021.
4350 Sec. 50.006. COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT; GIFTS, GRANTS,
4451 AND DONATIONS. A task force member is not entitled to compensation
4552 for service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for
4653 actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing task force
4754 duties. The task force may accept gifts, grants, and donations to
4855 pay for those expenses.
4956 Sec. 50.007. ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than December 1 of
5057 each year, the task force shall prepare and submit to the governor
5158 and the legislature an annual written report that summarizes the
5259 task force's work and includes any recommended actions or policy
5360 changes endorsed by the task force.
5461 SECTION 2. The sickle cell task force is not required to
5562 comply with the reporting requirements under Section 50.007, Health
5663 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, until December 1, 2020.
5764 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
58- ______________________________ ______________________________
59- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
60- I certify that H.B. No. 3405 was passed by the House on April
61- 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 18, 2 present, not
62- voting.
63- ______________________________
64- Chief Clerk of the House
65- I certify that H.B. No. 3405 was passed by the Senate on May
66- 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
67- ______________________________
68- Secretary of the Senate
69- APPROVED: _____________________
70- Date
71- _____________________
72- Governor
65+ * * * * *