1 | | - | H.B. No. 3420 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lambert, Raney (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3420 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to liability coverage for certain vehicles provided by |
---|
6 | 12 | | certain automobile repair facilities. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 1952, Insurance Code, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 1952.060 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 1952.060. REQUIRED PROVISION: LIABILITY COVERAGE FOR |
---|
11 | 17 | | TEMPORARY VEHICLES DURING POLICY TERM; PRIMARY COVERAGE REQUIRED. |
---|
12 | 18 | | (a) In this section: |
---|
13 | 19 | | (1) "Repair facility" means a person who rebuilds, |
---|
14 | 20 | | repairs, or services a motor vehicle for consideration or under a |
---|
15 | 21 | | warranty, service, or maintenance contract. |
---|
16 | 22 | | (2) "Resident relative" means an individual who: |
---|
17 | 23 | | (A) resides in the same household as the insured; |
---|
18 | 24 | | and |
---|
19 | 25 | | (B) is related to the insured within the third |
---|
20 | 26 | | degree of consanguinity or affinity as described by Chapter 573, |
---|
21 | 27 | | Government Code. |
---|
22 | 28 | | (3) "Temporary vehicle" includes a vehicle that is |
---|
23 | 29 | | loaned or provided to an insured by an automobile repair facility |
---|
24 | 30 | | for the insured's use while the insured's vehicle is at the facility |
---|
27 | 32 | | (A) in the lawful possession of the insured or |
---|
28 | 33 | | resident relative of the insured; |
---|
29 | 34 | | (B) not owned by the insured, any resident |
---|
30 | 35 | | relative of the insured, or any other person residing in the |
---|
31 | 36 | | insured's household; and |
---|
32 | 37 | | (C) operated by or in the possession of the |
---|
33 | 38 | | insured or resident relative of the insured until the vehicle is |
---|
34 | 39 | | returned to the repair facility. |
---|
35 | 40 | | (b) A personal automobile insurance policy, including a |
---|
36 | 41 | | policy issued by a county mutual insurance company, must define |
---|
37 | 42 | | temporary vehicle as defined by this section and include in the |
---|
38 | 43 | | policy's primary liability coverage primary liability coverage for |
---|
39 | 44 | | a temporary vehicle as a covered vehicle during the policy term. |
---|
40 | 45 | | (c) Coverage under this section is required only for a |
---|
41 | 46 | | vehicle that is: |
---|
42 | 47 | | (1) a private passenger automobile; or |
---|
43 | 48 | | (2) a pickup, utility vehicle, or van with a gross |
---|
45 | 50 | | delivery or transportation of goods, materials, or supplies, other |
---|
46 | 51 | | than samples, unless: |
---|
47 | 52 | | (A) the delivery of the goods, materials, or |
---|
48 | 53 | | supplies is not the primary use for which the vehicle is employed; |
---|
49 | 54 | | or |
---|
50 | 55 | | (B) the vehicle is used for farming or ranching. |
---|
51 | 56 | | (d) The coverage required by this section provides primary |
---|
52 | 57 | | coverage for the insured's legal liability for bodily injury and |
---|
53 | 58 | | property damage and for damage to the temporary vehicle, not excess |
---|
54 | 59 | | coverage. The coverage must insure: |
---|
55 | 60 | | (1) the person named in the personal automobile |
---|
56 | 61 | | insurance policy; and |
---|
57 | 62 | | (2) any resident relative of the insured and licensed |
---|
58 | 63 | | operator residing in the household except for an individual not |
---|
59 | 64 | | covered in a "named driver policy" under Section 1952.0545. |
---|
60 | 65 | | (e) The policy limits of a personal automobile insurance |
---|
61 | 66 | | policy must be available for the coverage required by this section. |
---|
62 | 67 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
63 | 68 | | to a personal automobile insurance policy that is delivered, issued |
---|
64 | 69 | | for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020. |
---|
65 | 70 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
68 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3420 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
69 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 13, 1 present, not |
---|
70 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
71 | | - | No. 3420 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 11, |
---|
72 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
73 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
74 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
75 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3420 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
76 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays |
---|
77 | | - | 3. |
---|
78 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
79 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
80 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Date |
---|
82 | | - | __________________ |
---|
83 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 71 | + | * * * * * |
---|