House | 05/08/2019 | Postponed 10/4/19 3:00 AM | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Postponed 5/8/19 4:00 PM | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Postponed 5/8/19 3:30 PM | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Urban Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Filed |