Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 16, 2019