Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3503 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019