Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 18, 2019