Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB36 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 36
1+By: Ortega, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 36
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
3+ April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2019, reported adversely,
5+ with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
6+ Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 36 By: Lucio
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to expedited proceedings in cases involving dangerously
614 damaged or deteriorated or substandard buildings or improvements in
715 certain municipalities.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 51.014(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
1018 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1119 (a) A person may appeal from an interlocutory order of a
1220 district court, county court at law, statutory probate court, or
1321 county court that:
1422 (1) appoints a receiver or trustee;
1523 (2) overrules a motion to vacate an order that
1624 appoints a receiver or trustee;
1725 (3) certifies or refuses to certify a class in a suit
1826 brought under Rule 42 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
1927 (4) grants or refuses a temporary injunction or grants
2028 or overrules a motion to dissolve a temporary injunction as
2129 provided by Chapter 65;
2230 (5) denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
2331 on an assertion of immunity by an individual who is an officer or
2432 employee of the state or a political subdivision of the state;
2533 (6) denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
2634 in whole or in part upon a claim against or defense by a member of
2735 the electronic or print media, acting in such capacity, or a person
2836 whose communication appears in or is published by the electronic or
2937 print media, arising under the free speech or free press clause of
3038 the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, or Article
3139 I, Section 8, of the Texas Constitution, or Chapter 73;
3240 (7) grants or denies the special appearance of a
3341 defendant under Rule 120a, Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, except
3442 in a suit brought under the Family Code;
3543 (8) grants or denies a plea to the jurisdiction by a
3644 governmental unit as that term is defined in Section 101.001;
3745 (9) denies all or part of the relief sought by a motion
3846 under Section 74.351(b), except that an appeal may not be taken from
3947 an order granting an extension under Section 74.351;
4048 (10) grants relief sought by a motion under Section
4149 74.351(l);
4250 (11) denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
4351 90.007;
4452 (12) denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
4553 27.003; [or]
4654 (13) denies a motion for summary judgment filed by an
4755 electric utility regarding liability in a suit subject to Section
4856 75.0022; or
4957 (14) denies a motion filed by a municipality with a
5058 population of 500,000 or more in an action filed under Section
5159 54.012(6) or 214.0012, Local Government Code.
5260 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 54, Local Government Code,
5361 is amended by adding Section 54.0155 to read as follows:
5462 Sec. 54.0155. EXPEDITED PROCEEDINGS FOR CERTAIN CIVIL
5563 ACTIONS. (a) A court shall expedite any proceeding, including an
5664 appeal in accordance with Subsection (b), related to a suit brought
5765 under this subchapter for the enforcement of an ordinance adopted
5866 by a municipality with a population of 500,000 or more relating to
5967 dangerously damaged or deteriorated structures or improvements as
6068 described by Section 54.012(6).
6169 (b) An appeal of a suit described by Subsection (a) is
6270 governed by the procedures for accelerated appeals in civil cases
6371 under the Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure. The appellate court
6472 shall render its final order or judgment with the least possible
6573 delay.
6674 SECTION 3. Section 214.001, Local Government Code, is
6775 amended by adding Subsection (s) to read as follows:
6876 (s) A court shall expedite any proceeding, including an
6977 appeal in accordance with Section 214.0012, related to a
7078 substandard building determination under this section by a
7179 municipality with a population of 500,000 or more.
7280 SECTION 4. Section 214.0012, Local Government Code, is
7381 amended by adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
7482 (i) An appeal under this section for an action in which a
7583 municipality with a population of 500,000 or more is a party is
7684 governed by the procedures for accelerated appeals in civil cases
7785 under the Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure. The district court
7886 shall render its final order or judgment with the least possible
7987 delay.
8088 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8189 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8290 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8391 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8492 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
85- ______________________________ ______________________________
86- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
87- I certify that H.B. No. 36 was passed by the House on April
88- 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121, Nays 12, 1 present, not
89- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
90- No. 36 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 102, Nays 38, 4
91- present, not voting.
92- ______________________________
93- Chief Clerk of the House
94- I certify that H.B. No. 36 was passed by the Senate, with
95- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays
96- 6.
97- ______________________________
98- Secretary of the Senate
99- APPROVED: __________________
100- Date
101- __________________
102- Governor
93+ * * * * *