Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3601 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Bell of Montgomery, et al. H.B. No. 3601
 (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recognition by the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board of competency-based education degree plans for
 members of the Texas military forces.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0521 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0521.  RECOGNITION OF COMPETENCY-BASED EDUCATION
 DEGREE PLANS FOR MEMBERS OF TEXAS MILITARY FORCES. (a)  In this
 section, "Texas military forces" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 437.001, Government Code.
 (b)  The board may approve an institution of higher education
 recognized by the board to offer a degree in coordination with the
 Texas Military Department that uses alternative methods of
 determining mastery of program content, including competency-based
 education.
 (c)  To be eligible for a degree approved under this section,
 a person must:
 (1)  have graduated from high school or received the
 equivalent of a high school diploma;
 (2)  satisfy the minimum active military service
 obligation to the Texas military forces for a degree plan as
 follows:
 (A)  for an associate degree, two years of
 service;
 (B)  for a baccalaureate degree, four years of
 service; and
 (C)  for a graduate degree, six years of service;
 and
 (3)  complete and meet the standards of the degree
 plan.
 (d)  The board may propose rules to establish requirements
 under which a person's training and experience acquired during the
 person's military service serve as proof of the person's
 demonstration of subject matter knowledge if that training and
 experience are verified by the Texas Military Department.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with degree plans
 offered for enrollment for the 2020-2021 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *