Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3630 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Meyer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3630
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3630 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting the use of certain aversive techniques on
 students enrolled in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.0023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0023.  PROHIBITED AVERSIVE TECHNIQUES. (a) In this
 section, "aversive technique" means a technique or intervention
 that is intended to reduce the likelihood of a behavior reoccurring
 by intentionally inflicting on a student significant physical or
 emotional discomfort or pain. The term includes a technique or
 intervention that:
 (1)  is designed to or likely to cause physical pain,
 other than an intervention or technique permitted under Section
 37.0011;
 (2)  notwithstanding Section 37.0011, is designed to or
 likely to cause physical pain through the use of electric shock or
 any procedure that involves the use of pressure points or joint
 locks;
 (3)  involves the directed release of a noxious, toxic,
 or otherwise unpleasant spray, mist, or substance near the
 student's face;
 (4)  denies adequate sleep, air, food, water, shelter,
 bedding, physical comfort, supervision, or access to a restroom
 facility;
 (5)  ridicules or demeans the student in a manner that
 adversely affects or endangers the learning or mental health of the
 student or constitutes verbal abuse;
 (6)  employs a device, material, or object that
 simultaneously immobilizes all four extremities, including any
 procedure that results in such immobilization known as prone or
 supine floor restraint;
 (7)  impairs the student's breathing, including any
 procedure that involves:
 (A)  applying pressure to the student's torso or
 neck; or
 (B)  obstructing the student's airway, including
 placing an object in, on, or over the student's mouth or nose or
 placing a bag, cover, or mask over the student's face;
 (8)  restricts the student's circulation;
 (9)  secures the student to a stationary object while
 the student is in a sitting or standing position;
 (10)  inhibits, reduces, or hinders the student's
 ability to communicate;
 (11)  involves the use of a chemical restraint;
 (12)  constitutes a use of timeout that precludes the
 student from being able to be involved in and progress
 appropriately in the required curriculum and, if applicable, toward
 the annual goals included in the student's individualized education
 program, including isolating the student by the use of physical
 barriers; or
 (13)  except as provided by Subsection (c), deprives
 the student of the use of one or more of the student's senses.
 (b)  A school district or school district employee or
 volunteer or an independent contractor of a school district may not
 apply an aversive technique, or by authorization, order, or
 consent, cause an aversive technique to be applied, to a student.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(13), an aversive
 technique described by Subsection (a)(13) may be used if the
 technique is executed in a manner that:
 (1)  does not cause the student pain or discomfort; or
 (2)  complies with the student's individualized
 education program or behavior intervention plan.
 (d)  Nothing in this section may be construed to prohibit a
 teacher from removing a student from class under Section 37.002.
 (e)  In adopting procedures under this section, the
 commissioner shall provide guidance to school district employees,
 volunteers, and independent contractors of school districts in
 avoiding a violation of Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *