Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3630 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3630
1+By: Meyer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3630
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
3+ May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
6+ May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3630 By: Lucio
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to prohibiting the use of certain aversive techniques on
614 students enrolled in public schools.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
917 amended by adding Section 37.0023 to read as follows:
1018 Sec. 37.0023. PROHIBITED AVERSIVE TECHNIQUES. (a) In this
1119 section, "aversive technique" means a technique or intervention
1220 that is intended to reduce the likelihood of a behavior reoccurring
1321 by intentionally inflicting on a student significant physical or
1422 emotional discomfort or pain. The term includes a technique or
1523 intervention that:
1624 (1) is designed to or likely to cause physical pain,
1725 other than an intervention or technique permitted under Section
1826 37.0011;
1927 (2) notwithstanding Section 37.0011, is designed to or
2028 likely to cause physical pain through the use of electric shock or
2129 any procedure that involves the use of pressure points or joint
2230 locks;
2331 (3) involves the directed release of a noxious, toxic,
2432 or otherwise unpleasant spray, mist, or substance near the
2533 student's face;
2634 (4) denies adequate sleep, air, food, water, shelter,
2735 bedding, physical comfort, supervision, or access to a restroom
2836 facility;
2937 (5) ridicules or demeans the student in a manner that
3038 adversely affects or endangers the learning or mental health of the
3139 student or constitutes verbal abuse;
3240 (6) employs a device, material, or object that
3341 simultaneously immobilizes all four extremities, including any
3442 procedure that results in such immobilization known as prone or
3543 supine floor restraint;
3644 (7) impairs the student's breathing, including any
3745 procedure that involves:
3846 (A) applying pressure to the student's torso or
3947 neck; or
4048 (B) obstructing the student's airway, including
4149 placing an object in, on, or over the student's mouth or nose or
4250 placing a bag, cover, or mask over the student's face;
4351 (8) restricts the student's circulation;
4452 (9) secures the student to a stationary object while
4553 the student is in a sitting or standing position;
4654 (10) inhibits, reduces, or hinders the student's
4755 ability to communicate;
4856 (11) involves the use of a chemical restraint;
4957 (12) constitutes a use of timeout that precludes the
5058 student from being able to be involved in and progress
5159 appropriately in the required curriculum and, if applicable, toward
5260 the annual goals included in the student's individualized education
5361 program, including isolating the student by the use of physical
5462 barriers; or
5563 (13) except as provided by Subsection (c), deprives
5664 the student of the use of one or more of the student's senses.
5765 (b) A school district or school district employee or
5866 volunteer or an independent contractor of a school district may not
5967 apply an aversive technique, or by authorization, order, or
6068 consent, cause an aversive technique to be applied, to a student.
6169 (c) Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(13), an aversive
6270 technique described by Subsection (a)(13) may be used if the
6371 technique is executed in a manner that:
6472 (1) does not cause the student pain or discomfort; or
6573 (2) complies with the student's individualized
6674 education program or behavior intervention plan.
6775 (d) Nothing in this section may be construed to prohibit a
6876 teacher from removing a student from class under Section 37.002.
6977 (e) In adopting procedures under this section, the
7078 commissioner shall provide guidance to school district employees,
7179 volunteers, and independent contractors of school districts in
7280 avoiding a violation of Subsection (b).
7381 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
7482 school year.
7583 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7684 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7785 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7886 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7987 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
80- ______________________________ ______________________________
81- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
82- I certify that H.B. No. 3630 was passed by the House on May 3,
83- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 1 present, not
84- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
85- No. 3630 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0,
86- 3 present, not voting.
87- ______________________________
88- Chief Clerk of the House
89- I certify that H.B. No. 3630 was passed by the Senate, with
90- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
91- 0.
92- ______________________________
93- Secretary of the Senate
94- APPROVED: __________________
95- Date
96- __________________
97- Governor
88+ * * * * *