House | 05/03/2019 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Companion considered in lieu of SB 2390 | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Filed |