Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Record vote RV#86 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Record vote RV#78 | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Amended 1-Tinderholt | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 11/15/2018 | Filed |