House | 04/16/2019 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Filed |