1 | | - | H.B. No. 3642 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Krause (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 3642 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3642 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the jurisdiction of a county court at law in Tarrant |
---|
6 | 14 | | County. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 25.2222(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 17 | | to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a) A county court at law in Tarrant County has jurisdiction |
---|
11 | 19 | | over all causes and proceedings, civil [matters] and criminal |
---|
12 | 20 | | [causes], original and appellate, prescribed by law for county |
---|
13 | 21 | | courts. [The County Court at Law No. 1 of Tarrant County also has |
---|
14 | 22 | | jurisdiction over all criminal matters and causes, original and |
---|
15 | 23 | | appellate, prescribed by law for county courts. The County Courts |
---|
16 | 24 | | at Law Nos. 2 and 3 of Tarrant County do not have criminal |
---|
17 | 25 | | jurisdiction.] Notwithstanding any other provision, a county court |
---|
18 | 26 | | at law in Tarrant County has jurisdiction on any appeal from a |
---|
19 | 27 | | municipal court of record in Tarrant County that is not an appeal of |
---|
20 | 28 | | a criminal law case or proceeding. |
---|
21 | 29 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
22 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
23 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
24 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3642 was passed by the House on April |
---|
25 | | - | 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 2, 2 present, not |
---|
26 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
27 | | - | No. 3642 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, |
---|
28 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3642 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
32 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
33 | | - | 0. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
36 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Date |
---|
38 | | - | __________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 30 | + | * * * * * |
---|