1 | | - | H.B. No. 3652 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 3652 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Creighton, West) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
| 5 | + | Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 6 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to the creation of a state repository for open educational |
---|
6 | 13 | | resources by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board. |
---|
7 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
9 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 61.0670 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 17 | | Sec. 61.0670. STATE REPOSITORY OF OPEN EDUCATIONAL |
---|
11 | 18 | | RESOURCES. (a) In this section, "open educational resource" has |
---|
12 | 19 | | the meaning assigned by Section 51.451. |
---|
13 | 20 | | (b) The board shall contract with a high-quality open |
---|
14 | 21 | | educational resource repository to develop and maintain a web |
---|
15 | 22 | | portal customized to meet the needs of individual institutions of |
---|
16 | 23 | | higher education, students, and others who may benefit from access |
---|
17 | 24 | | to open educational resources. |
---|
18 | 25 | | (c) Open educational resources available through the portal |
---|
19 | 26 | | must be searchable by course or learning outcome, program or field |
---|
20 | 27 | | of study, marketable skills, college readiness, and other topics as |
---|
21 | 28 | | determined by the board. |
---|
22 | 29 | | (d) The portal must provide access to repositories |
---|
23 | 30 | | maintaining a wide range of open educational resources, including |
---|
24 | 31 | | textbooks, full courses, course materials, modules, images, |
---|
25 | 32 | | videos, assessment software, and any other tools, materials, or |
---|
26 | 33 | | techniques used to support learning. |
---|
27 | 34 | | (e) Resources developed with state funds shall be made |
---|
28 | 35 | | available under a Creative Commons license and submitted for use as |
---|
29 | 36 | | an open educational resource through a repository available through |
---|
30 | 37 | | the portal. A publisher may submit instructional materials for |
---|
31 | 38 | | inclusion in a repository available through the portal. |
---|
32 | 39 | | (f) The board may request the assistance of the Learning |
---|
33 | 40 | | Technology Advisory Committee to establish, maintain, and market |
---|
34 | 41 | | the web portal required under this section. |
---|
35 | 42 | | SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas |
---|
36 | 43 | | Higher Education Coordinating Board shall develop the web portal |
---|
37 | 44 | | required under Section 61.0670, Education Code, as added by this |
---|
38 | 45 | | Act. |
---|
39 | 46 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3652 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
43 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 6, 1 present, not |
---|
44 | | - | voting. |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
47 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3652 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
48 | | - | 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
51 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Date |
---|
53 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|