Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB368 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019