Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Point of order sustained Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Record vote RV#1310
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Amended 1-Israel
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amended 2-Israel
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amended 1-Kuempel
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|