1 | | - | H.B. No. 3782 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Harless, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 3782 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & |
---|
| 4 | + | Rural Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3782 By: Creighton |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the right to remove property encroaching on areas owned |
---|
6 | 14 | | or controlled by the Harris County Flood Control District. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 360, Acts of the 45th Legislature, |
---|
9 | 17 | | Regular Session, 1937, is amended by adding Section 2A to read as |
---|
10 | 18 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 2A. Right to Remove Property. (a) In this section, |
---|
12 | 20 | | "district" means the Harris County Flood Control District. |
---|
13 | 21 | | (b) In order to carry out district purposes, the district |
---|
14 | 22 | | may remove real or personal property placed on land owned by the |
---|
15 | 23 | | district or land subject to an easement held by the district, |
---|
16 | 24 | | regardless of when the real or personal property was put in place |
---|
17 | 25 | | and without the consent of the owner of the property. The district |
---|
18 | 26 | | must send notice by certified mail to the owner of property on which |
---|
19 | 27 | | the district intends to act under this section. Not earlier than |
---|
20 | 28 | | the 30th day after the date the notice is sent, the district must |
---|
21 | 29 | | send a second notice by certified mail. The district may use |
---|
22 | 30 | | existing civil lawsuit processes against the owner of the property |
---|
23 | 31 | | to recover the cost of removing the property not earlier than the |
---|
24 | 32 | | 30th day after the date the second notice was received. |
---|
25 | 33 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3782 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
29 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 11, 2 present, not |
---|
30 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
31 | | - | No. 3782 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 24, |
---|
32 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
35 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3782 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
36 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
37 | | - | 0. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Date |
---|
42 | | - | __________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 34 | + | * * * * * |
---|