Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3786 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/08/2019

                    By: Coleman H.B. No. 3786


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing family drug courts in counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 122, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 122.005 and 122.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 122.005.  FAMILY DRUG COURT STUDY. (a)  Not later than
 September 1, 2018, the commissioners court of each county that has
 not established a family drug court program shall study the effect
 the creation of a family drug court would have in the county.  The
 sheriff and, as applicable, the county attorney, district
 attorney, or criminal district attorney shall assist in conducting
 the study.  Input from the following persons located in the county
 as applicable shall be requested: judges, CPS caseworkers and
 supervisors, attorney ad litems, guardian ad litems, treatment
 providers, child/family therapists, treatment providers, peer
 recovery coach providers, domestic violence advocates, housing
 partners, drug court coordinators, drug court services managers,
 drug court case managers.  The study must analyze the effectiveness
 of:
 (1)  creating a court that specializes in cases in
 which a parent or person standing in parental relation suffers from
 drug addiction; and
 (2)  case management used by a family drug court
 program, including the involvement of Department of Family and
 Protective Services caseworkers, court-appointed case managers,
 and court-appointed special advocates, to rehabilitate a parent or
 person standing in parental relation who has had a child removed
 from the parent's or person's care by the department, or under
 investigation to determine if a child should be removed from the
 parent's or person's care by the department.
 (b)  This section expires January 1, 2021.
 Sec. 122.0051.  GRANT FUNDING FOR FAMILY DRUG COURTS. (a)
 The county family drug court fund is a dedicated account in the
 general revenue fund.
 (b)  The county family drug court fund consists of:
 (1)  appropriations of money to the fund by the
 legislature; and
 (2)  gifts, grants, including grants from the federal
 government, and other donations received for the fund.
 (c)  The Health and Human Service Commission may provide
 counties who submit their study conducted under subsection 122.005
 for consideration with funds to set up and administer a family drug
 court in their
 SECTION 2.  The Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules regarding the criteria for awarding grants described
 under subsection 122.0051 by January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.