Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3803 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Guillen, Klick (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3803
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3803 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maximum amount of an administrative penalty
 assessed on certain long-term care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 252.065(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The penalty for a facility with fewer than 60 beds shall
 be not less than $100 or more than $1,000 for each violation.  The
 penalty for a facility with 60 beds or more shall be not less than
 $100 or more than $5,000 for each violation.  Each day a violation
 occurs or continues is a separate violation for purposes of
 imposing a penalty. The total amount of a penalty assessed under
 this subsection for each day a violation occurs or continues may not
 exceed:
 (1)  $5,000 for a facility with fewer than 60 beds; and
 (2)  $25,000 for a facility with 60 beds or more.
 SECTION 2.  The Health and Human Services Commission is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money to the commission specifically for
 that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the commission may, but is not
 required to, implement a provision of this Act using other
 appropriations that are available for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *