1 | | - | H.B. No. 3809 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Goldman, et al. H.B. No. 3809 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Watson, Hughes, RodrÃguez) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 5 | + | Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3809 By: Hughes |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the limitations period for personal injury claims that |
---|
6 | 15 | | arise from certain offenses involving child sexual abuse. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 16.0045(a), Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
9 | 18 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | (a) A person must bring suit for personal injury not later |
---|
11 | 20 | | than 30 [15] years after the day the cause of action accrues if the |
---|
12 | 21 | | injury arises as a result of conduct that violates: |
---|
13 | 22 | | (1) Section 22.011(a)(2), Penal Code (sexual assault |
---|
14 | 23 | | of a child); |
---|
15 | 24 | | (2) Section 22.021(a)(1)(B), Penal Code (aggravated |
---|
16 | 25 | | sexual assault of a child); |
---|
17 | 26 | | (3) Section 21.02, Penal Code (continuous sexual abuse |
---|
18 | 27 | | of young child or children); |
---|
19 | 28 | | (4) Section 20A.02(a)(7)(A), (B), (C), (D), or (H) or |
---|
20 | 29 | | Section 20A.02(a)(8), Penal Code, involving an activity described |
---|
21 | 30 | | by Section 20A.02(a)(7)(A), (B), (C), (D), or (H) or sexual conduct |
---|
22 | 31 | | with a child trafficked in the manner described by Section |
---|
23 | 32 | | 20A.02(a)(7), Penal Code (certain sexual trafficking of a child); |
---|
24 | 33 | | (5) Section 43.05(a)(2), Penal Code (compelling |
---|
25 | 34 | | prostitution by a child); or |
---|
26 | 35 | | (6) Section 21.11, Penal Code (indecency with a |
---|
27 | 36 | | child). |
---|
28 | 37 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to a |
---|
29 | 38 | | cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of this |
---|
30 | 39 | | Act or a cause of action that accrued before the effective date of |
---|
31 | 40 | | this Act, if the limitations period applicable to the cause of |
---|
32 | 41 | | action immediately before the effective date of this Act has not |
---|
33 | 42 | | expired before the effective date of this Act. |
---|
34 | 43 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
37 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3809 was passed by the House on May 2, |
---|
38 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
39 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
40 | | - | No. 3809 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, |
---|
41 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
44 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3809 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
45 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
46 | | - | 0. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
49 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Date |
---|
51 | | - | __________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 44 | + | * * * * * |
---|