Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3871 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3871
1+By: Krause (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3871
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
3+ May 6, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Transportation; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3871 By: Schwertner
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the process for establishing speed limits on roads near
614 certain schools.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 545.355(b), Transportation Code, is
917 amended to read as follows:
1018 (b) The commissioners court of a county may declare a lower
1119 speed limit of not less than:
1220 (1) 30 miles per hour on a county road or highway to
1321 which this section applies, if the commissioners court determines
1422 that the prima facie speed limit on the road or highway is
1523 unreasonable or unsafe; or
1624 (2) 20 miles per hour:
1725 (A) in a residence district, unless the roadway
1826 has been designated as a major thoroughfare by a city planning
1927 commission; or
2028 (B) on a county road or highway to which this
2129 section applies that is located within 500 feet of an elementary,
2230 secondary, or open-enrollment charter school or an institution of
2331 higher education, if approved under Section 545.357.
2432 SECTION 2. Section 545.357, Transportation Code, is amended
2533 to read as follows:
2634 Sec. 545.357. CONSIDERATION OF [PUBLIC HEARING TO CONSIDER]
2735 SPEED LIMITS WHERE CERTAIN SCHOOLS ARE LOCATED. (a) The governing
2836 body of a municipality in which a public or private elementary or
2937 secondary school, an open-enrollment charter school, or an
3038 institution of higher education [as defined by Section 61.003(8) or
3139 (15), Education Code,] is located shall, on request of the
3240 governing body of a school or institution of higher education, hold
3341 a public hearing at least once each calendar year to consider prima
3442 facie speed limits on a highway in the municipality, including a
3543 highway of the state highway system, near the school or institution
3644 of higher education.
3745 (b) If a county road outside the state highway system is
3846 located within 500 feet of a public or private elementary or
3947 secondary school, an open-enrollment charter school, or an
4048 institution of higher education that is not in a municipality, the
4149 commissioners court of the county, on request of the governing body
4250 of a school or institution of higher education, shall hold a public
4351 hearing at least once each calendar year to consider the prima facie
4452 speed limit on the road near the school or institution of higher
4553 education.
4654 (c) A municipal governing body or commissioners court, on
4755 request of the governing body of a school or institution of higher
4856 education, may hold one public hearing for all public and private
4957 elementary and secondary schools, open-enrollment charter schools,
5058 and institutions of higher education in its jurisdiction.
5159 (d) The Texas Transportation Commission, on request of the
5260 governing body of a school or institution of higher education,
5361 shall hold a public hearing at least once each calendar year to
5462 consider prima facie speed limits on highways in the state highway
5563 system that are near public or private elementary or secondary
5664 schools, open-enrollment charter schools, or institutions of
5765 higher education.
5866 (e) On request of the governing body of a school or
5967 institution of higher education following a public hearing held
6068 under this section, the commissioners court, municipal governing
6169 body, or Texas Transportation Commission, as applicable, shall
6270 conduct an engineering and traffic investigation for the highway or
6371 road that is the subject of the request. On review of the results of
6472 the investigation, the commissioners court, municipal governing
6573 body, or Texas Transportation Commission has the same authority and
6674 discretion to alter prima facie speed limits as provided by Section
6775 545.353, 545.355, or 545.356, as applicable. Following each public
6876 hearing held under this section, the governing body of a school or
6977 institution of higher education may make only one request under
7078 this subsection for an engineering and traffic investigation.
7179 (f) In this section:
7280 (1) "Governing body of a school or institution of
7381 higher education" means:
7482 (A) the board of trustees of the school district
7583 in which a public elementary or secondary school is located;
7684 (B) the governing body of a private elementary or
7785 secondary school;
7886 (C) the governing body of an open-enrollment
7987 charter school; or
8088 (D) the governing board of an institution of
8189 higher education.
8290 (2) "Institution of higher education" means an
8391 institution of higher education or a private or independent
8492 institution of higher education, as those terms are defined by
8593 Section 61.003, Education Code.
8694 (3) "Open-enrollment charter school" has the meaning
8795 assigned by Section 5.001, Education Code.
8896 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
89- ______________________________ ______________________________
90- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
91- I certify that H.B. No. 3871 was passed by the House on May 3,
92- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
93- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
94- No. 3871 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0,
95- 2 present, not voting.
96- ______________________________
97- Chief Clerk of the House
98- I certify that H.B. No. 3871 was passed by the Senate, with
99- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
100- 0.
101- ______________________________
102- Secretary of the Senate
103- APPROVED: __________________
104- Date
105- __________________
106- Governor
97+ * * * * *