Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Property Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Record vote RV#1201
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1159
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(b)(9)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 6-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 4-Bailes
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1158
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1157
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-J. González
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2018
|
Filed
|
|
|