Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3884 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Wilson (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3884
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to dissemination of bacterial meningitis information by
 school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 38.0025(a) and (c), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Department of State Health Services [agency] shall
 prescribe procedures by which each school district shall provide
 information relating to bacterial meningitis to its students and
 their parents each school year. The procedures must ensure that the
 information is reasonably likely to come to the attention of the
 parents of each student. The department [agency] shall prescribe
 the form and content of the information. The information must
 cover:
 (1)  the symptoms of the disease, how it may be
 diagnosed, and its possible consequences if untreated;
 (2)  how the disease is transmitted, how it may be
 prevented, and the relative risk of contracting the disease for
 primary and secondary school students;
 (3)  the availability and effectiveness of vaccination
 against and treatment for the disease, and a brief description of
 the risks and possible side effects of vaccination; and
 (4)  sources of additional information regarding the
 disease, including any appropriate office of the school district
 and the appropriate office of the department [Texas Department of
 Health].
 (c)  A school district, with the written consent of the
 Department of State Health Services [agency], may provide the
 information required by this section to its students and their
 parents by a method different from the method prescribed by the
 department [agency] under Subsection (a) if the department [agency]
 determines that method would be effective in bringing the
 information to the attention of the parents of each student.
 SECTION 2.  Section 38.0025(b), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Department of State Health Services shall develop
 the procedures under Section 38.0025, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *