Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Record vote RV#1017
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Amended 1-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Postponed 5/3/19 2:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 3; Article III, Section 35
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Amended 2-Stickland
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Amended 1-Huberty
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|