Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB396 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 396
1+By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 396
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House March 25, 2019;
3+ March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to acceptable uses of the instructional materials and
612 technology fund and the instructional materials and technology
713 allotment.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Section 31.021(c), Education Code, as amended by
1016 Chapters 581 (S.B. 810) and 705 (H.B. 3526), Acts of the 85th
1117 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, is reenacted and amended to
1218 read as follows:
1319 (c) Money in the state instructional materials and
1420 technology fund shall be used to:
1521 (1) fund the instructional materials and technology
1622 allotment, as provided by Section 31.0211;
1723 (2) purchase special instructional materials for the
1824 education of blind and visually impaired students in public
1925 schools;
2026 (3) pay the expenses associated with the instructional
2127 materials adoption and review process under this chapter;
2228 (4) pay the expenses associated with the purchase or
2329 licensing of open education resource instructional material;
2430 (5) pay the expenses associated with the purchase of
2531 instructional material, including [intrastate] freight and
2632 shipping and the insurance expenses associated with [intrastate]
2733 freight and shipping;
2834 (6) fund the technology lending grant program
2935 established under Section 32.301;
3036 (7) provide funding to the Texas School for the Blind
3137 and Visually Impaired, the Texas School for the Deaf, and the Texas
3238 Juvenile Justice Department; and
3339 (8) pay the expenses associated with the instructional
3440 materials web portal developed under Section 31.081.
3541 SECTION 2. Section 31.0211(c), Education Code, is amended
3642 to read as follows:
3743 (c) Subject to Subsection (d), funds allotted under this
3844 section may be used to:
3945 (1) purchase:
4046 (A) materials on the list adopted by the
4147 commissioner, as provided by Section 31.0231;
4248 (B) instructional materials, regardless of
4349 whether the instructional materials are on the list adopted under
4450 Section 31.024;
4551 (C) consumable instructional materials,
4652 including workbooks;
4753 (D) instructional materials for use in bilingual
4854 education classes, as provided by Section 31.029;
4955 (E) instructional materials for use in college
5056 preparatory courses under Section 28.014, as provided by Section
5157 31.031;
5258 (F) supplemental instructional materials, as
5359 provided by Section 31.035;
5460 (G) state-developed open education resource
5561 instructional materials, as provided by Subchapter B-1;
5662 (H) instructional materials and technological
5763 equipment under any continuing contracts of the district in effect
5864 on September 1, 2011; [and]
5965 (I) technological equipment necessary to support
6066 the use of materials included on the list adopted by the
6167 commissioner under Section 31.0231 or any instructional materials
6268 purchased with an allotment under this section; and
6369 (J) inventory software or systems for storing,
6470 managing, and accessing instructional materials and analyzing the
6571 usage and effectiveness of the instructional materials; and
6672 (2) pay:
6773 (A) for training educational personnel directly
6874 involved in student learning in the appropriate use of
6975 instructional materials and for providing for access to
7076 technological equipment for instructional use; and
7177 (B) the salary and other expenses of an employee
7278 who provides technical support for the use of technological
7379 equipment directly involved in student learning.
7480 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
75- ______________________________ ______________________________
76- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
77- I certify that H.B. No. 396 was passed by the House on March
78- 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 1 present, not
79- voting.
80- ______________________________
81- Chief Clerk of the House
82- I certify that H.B. No. 396 was passed by the Senate on May
83- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
84- ______________________________
85- Secretary of the Senate
86- APPROVED: _____________________
87- Date
88- _____________________
89- Governor
81+ * * * * *