House | 05/09/2019 | Returned to committee | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 18(a)(4) | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Filed |