Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB405 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Minjarez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 405
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019;
 April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating June as Neonatal Abstinence Syndrome
 Awareness Month.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.112 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.112.  NEONATAL ABSTINENCE SYNDROME AWARENESS
 MONTH. June is Neonatal Abstinence Syndrome Awareness Month to
 increase awareness of neonatal abstinence syndrome and to
 encourage:
 (1)  awareness of the dangers of opioid and substance
 abuse during pregnancy to prevent neonatal abstinence syndrome;
 (2)  the creation and update of lists of recommended
 materials to address neonatal abstinence syndrome available
 through the Department of State Health Services and the Health and
 Human Services Commission;
 (3)  electronic circulation of and posting on state and
 local agency websites of recommended treatment and recovery
 resources;
 (4)  the availability of resources for mothers-to-be
 and new mothers with substance abuse disorders, including health
 care services and recovery support services; and
 (5)  collaboration between state and federal
 governmental agencies, hospitals, private health care practices,
 health insurance providers, Medicaid providers, and mental health
 agencies to increase awareness.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *