Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4110 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/07/2019

                            86R13299 JAM-D
 By: Zwiener H.B. No. 4110


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study evaluating and making recommendations for the
 regulation of on-site sewage disposal systems in the recharge zone
 of the Edwards Aquifer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (2)  "On-site sewage disposal system" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 366.002, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY. (a)  The commission shall conduct a study
 to evaluate:
 (1)  the regulation of on-site sewage disposal systems
 in the recharge zone of the Edwards Aquifer;
 (2)  the effects of on-site sewage disposal systems on
 the recharge zone of the Edwards Aquifer and the Edwards Aquifer;
 and
 (3)  best management practices for the regulation of
 on-site sewage disposal systems in the recharge zone of the Edwards
 Aquifer that:
 (A)  protect the supply of water, including
 potable water, to users of groundwater from the Edwards Aquifer
 through more restrictive regulations;
 (B)  do not contribute to adverse toxic effects on
 aquatic life in the Edwards Aquifer; and
 (C)  do not contribute to adverse toxic effects on
 human health resulting from the consumption of water from the
 Edwards Aquifer.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the commission shall solicit
 and consider information from the scientific and engineering
 community and other stakeholders.
 (c)  The commission may contract with any appropriate person
 to assist in conducting the study.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than March 1, 2020, the
 commission shall make publicly available on its Internet website a
 report of the findings and recommendations of the study conducted
 under this Act. In the report, the commission must include findings
 that address the study objectives described in Section 2(a)(3) of
 this Act. The commission must include in the report
 recommendations, based on the findings, for on-site sewage disposal
 regulatory practices that can be used to achieve the objectives of
 Section 2(a)(3) of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  RULES TO IMPLEMENT.  (a)  Not later than
 September 1, 2020, the commission shall develop proposed rules the
 commission considers appropriate to implement the findings and
 recommendations of the report and shall file notice of the proposed
 rules as provided by Section 2001.023, Government Code.
 (b)  A rule proposed under Subsection (a) of this section
 applies only to an action, including a filing of an application for
 a permit or permit amendment, taken on or after the effective date
 of the rule. An action taken before the effective date of a rule
 proposed under Subsection (a) of this section is governed by the law
 in effect at the time the action was taken, and an application for a
 permit or permit amendment must be approved or denied on the basis
 of the law in effect at the time the application is filed.
 SECTION 5.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires on the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the commission adopts rules proposed
 under Section 4 of this Act; or
 (2)  December 1, 2021.
 SECTION 6.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.