Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4120 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2019

                    By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 4120
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4120 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the financial security requirement for providers
 obligated under certain service contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1304.151, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and
 (b-3) to read as follows:
 (b)  If the provider ensures its obligations under
 Subsection (a)(2), the amount maintained in the reserve account may
 not be less than an amount equal to 40 percent of the gross
 consideration the provider received from consumers from the sale of
 all service contracts issued and outstanding in this state, minus
 any claims paid. The executive director may review and examine the
 reserve account. Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), the [The]
 amount of the security deposit may not be less than $250,000. The
 provider must submit to the executive director on request a copy of
 the provider's financial statements that must be prepared in
 accordance with generally accepted accounting principles, be
 without qualification as to the going concern status of the
 provider, and be audited by an independent certified public
 accountant. The commission by rule may require the provider to
 submit additional financial reports.
 (b-1)  Subject to Subsection (b-2), the amount of the
 security deposit required under Subsection (b) may not be less than
 $25,000 if the provider:
 (1)  is a motor vehicle dealer licensed under Chapter
 2301; and
 (2)  offers to sell service contracts only on motor
 vehicles sold by the provider.
 (b-2)  The amount of the security deposit required under
 Subsection (b-1) is:
 (1)  $25,000 for a motor vehicle dealer that generated
 $1,125,000 or less in annual gross revenue in this state from the
 sale of service contracts in the preceding year;
 (2)  $50,000 for a motor vehicle dealer that generated
 more than $1,125,000 and not more than $2,500,000 in annual gross
 revenue in this state from the sale of service contracts in the
 preceding year; and
 (3)  $75,000 for a motor vehicle dealer that generated
 more than $2,500,000 in annual gross revenue in this state from the
 sale of service contracts in the preceding year.
 (b-3)  If a motor vehicle dealer described by Subsection
 (b-1) has no gross revenue in this state from the sale of service
 contracts in the preceding year, the security deposit shall be
 $25,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *